California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR7 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/17/2021

                            Enrolled  February 17, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 7Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 7, Ochoa Bogh. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, President Ronald Reagan declared February 4, 1987, as the first National Women in Sports Day, in recognition of the history of womens athletics and the progress made by the Title IX amendment passed in 1972, codifying nondiscrimination in sports programs; andWHEREAS, National Girls and Women in Sports Day exists to acknowledge past, and recognize current, sports achievements, the positive influence of sports participation, and the continuing struggle for equity, pay, and access for women in sports; andWHEREAS, Participation in sports is acknowledged as a positive force in developing and promoting the physical, mental, moral, social, and emotional well-being of all individuals. In addition to establishing a healthy, active lifestyle, sports build confidence, leadership skills, and the ability to work with a team; andWHEREAS, A need for increased opportunities exists for girls to participate in and pursue physical activity at the community and scholastic levels to improve their health and well-being and to develop lifelong fitness habits at an early age; andWHEREAS, Girls and womens athletics is one of the most effective avenues available through which women may develop self-discipline, initiative, and confidence, regardless of background; andWHEREAS, Girls and women of all ages are encouraged to participate in, and contribute to, sports at all levels of competition and help prepare the next generation of female sports leaders; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California,That February 1, 2021, to February 6, 2021, inclusive, be declared California Girls and Women in Sports Week to acknowledge the contributions of, and to recognize, girls and women in sports in California; and be it furtherResolved, That all teachers, school administrators, and community policymakers take appropriate measures to ensure equity in sports programs and activities in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 17, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 7Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 7, Ochoa Bogh. Digest Key

 Enrolled  February 17, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2021

Enrolled  February 17, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 7

Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021

Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)
February 01, 2021

 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 7, Ochoa Bogh. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, President Ronald Reagan declared February 4, 1987, as the first National Women in Sports Day, in recognition of the history of womens athletics and the progress made by the Title IX amendment passed in 1972, codifying nondiscrimination in sports programs; and

WHEREAS, National Girls and Women in Sports Day exists to acknowledge past, and recognize current, sports achievements, the positive influence of sports participation, and the continuing struggle for equity, pay, and access for women in sports; and

WHEREAS, Participation in sports is acknowledged as a positive force in developing and promoting the physical, mental, moral, social, and emotional well-being of all individuals. In addition to establishing a healthy, active lifestyle, sports build confidence, leadership skills, and the ability to work with a team; and

WHEREAS, A need for increased opportunities exists for girls to participate in and pursue physical activity at the community and scholastic levels to improve their health and well-being and to develop lifelong fitness habits at an early age; and

WHEREAS, Girls and womens athletics is one of the most effective avenues available through which women may develop self-discipline, initiative, and confidence, regardless of background; and

WHEREAS, Girls and women of all ages are encouraged to participate in, and contribute to, sports at all levels of competition and help prepare the next generation of female sports leaders; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California,That February 1, 2021, to February 6, 2021, inclusive, be declared California Girls and Women in Sports Week to acknowledge the contributions of, and to recognize, girls and women in sports in California; and be it further

Resolved, That all teachers, school administrators, and community policymakers take appropriate measures to ensure equity in sports programs and activities in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.