|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 791, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3546.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2764.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1593.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|