California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB10 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 15, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023