Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1700.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|