California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Amended

Bill August 14, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023