|
09/30/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 274, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3067.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2356.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1546.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|