California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill June 6, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023