|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3043.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2396.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1366.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|