California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill August 17, 2023
Bill June 22, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023