California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill August 16, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023