Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 1905.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|