California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Amended

Bill July 13, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023