|
09/30/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3240.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2557.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1772.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|