California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill July 5, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023