Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 2141.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|