California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Amended

Bill July 3, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023