Senate | 06/26/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and PUB S. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2037.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Read first time. To print. |