California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill July 6, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023