|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2674.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2039.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1463.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|