California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1686 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2023

Amended

Bill June 26, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023