|
09/27/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 3169.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2371.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 1697.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|