California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2023

Amended

Bill August 22, 2023
Bill July 10, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023