Senate | 09/01/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2023 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2135.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 2. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Read first time. To print. |