|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1813.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|