|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 941, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 3. Page 5598.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) .
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|