California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 18, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024