|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5031.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|