California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024