|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5612.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|