California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1843 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 28, 2024
Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024