Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5403.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|