|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 232, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 12.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 12. Page 4918.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|