California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1855 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 21, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024