|
09/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4399.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|