California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1880 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2024

Amended

Bill June 11, 2024
Bill May 23, 2024