|
07/15/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4666.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5357.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|