California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024