Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5157.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|