|
09/12/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 219, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4661.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|