California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2024

Amended

Bill August 8, 2024
Bill May 15, 2024