|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5031.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|