California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2037 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 20, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 4, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024