Assembly
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5538.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|