California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024