Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 17. Page 5326.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|