California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Amended

Bill June 3, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024