|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|