California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024