|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5413.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|