Assembly
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 5565.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|